Financial history CLUB 87 FOR THE YOUNGER DISABLED OF LINCOLN

Charity number: 701755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.21k £11.44k £12.48k £12.02k £0
Total expenditure £9.69k £10.03k £10.48k £10.84k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A