LANCASTER AND MORECAMBE SIGHT SAVER APPEAL

Charity number: 701762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 24 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 27 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 11 June 2017 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required