ACTIVE CHESHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As the lead body for sport and physical activity in the Cheshire sub-region, we perform a vital role in bringing together local people and national sports bodies. We use our unique local knowledge, influence and insight to ensure that national funding and resources reach the places where they will have the most impact on participation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,068,248
Donations and legacies | £991.06k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £68.20k | |
Investments | £8.99k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£884,594
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £884.59k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £991,064 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £884.59k | |
Retained for future use | £183.65k |
People

9 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Warrington
Governance
- 24 July 1989: Standard registration
- SPORT CHESHIRE (Working name)
- ACTIVE CHESHIRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- CHESHIRE AND WARRINGTON SPORTS PARTNERSHIP TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- CHESHIRE SPORTS TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- SPORT CHESHIRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Betts | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Wogel | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Anne Underhill | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Alexander Onions | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Michael Sullivan | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Thompson | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Anne Morris-Bates | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Lancaster | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Law-Lyons | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Waterman | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £714.69k | £645.89k | £876.44k | £775.31k | £1.07m | |
|
Total expenditure | £797.29k | £753.14k | £886.55k | £767.55k | £884.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £38.00k | £48.00k | £38.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £550.91k | £760.48k | £768.75k | £991.06k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £598.10k | £613.91k | £808.35k | £727.67k | £991.06k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £31.63k | £68.05k | £46.12k | £68.20k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £15.93k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.03k | £355 | £43 | £1.52k | £8.99k | |
|
Income - Other | £99.54k | £6.82k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £797.29k | £753.14k | £886.55k | £767.55k | £884.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £258.01k | £10.86k | £41.92k | £38.08k | £11.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £117.63k | £186.10k | £355.46k | £236.60k | £385.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.88k | £3.61k | £7.45k | £9.00k | £5.75k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £490.68k | £414.97k | £534.36k | £764.81k | £663.12k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £1.00k | -£628.00k | -£233.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £128.49k | £145.75k | £252.10k | £459.34k | £202.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/07/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/07/2014 as amended on 29 Oct 2020 as amended on 26 Nov 2020 as amended on 04 Dec 2020 as amended on 01 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
5.1 To provide or assist in the provision of opportunities for the benefit of the inhabitants of Warrington, Cheshire East and Cheshire West and Chester for physical and athletic recreation or other leisure-time and athletic activity, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants; 5.2 To relieve the need, hardship and distress of such inhabitants in conditions of need, hardship and distress by providing financial or other assistance so enabling them to participate in the opportunities provided by the Charity; 5.3 To disseminate or assist in the dissemination of information encouraging such inhabitants to participate in physical recreation (including sport) so as to promote their health and well-being, and in pursuance of the two first-mentioned main objects, but not otherwise, the Charity may in the interests of social welfare: 5.3.1 Provide or assist in the provision of sporting opportunities for disabled people so as to relieve or alleviate their conditions; 5.3.2 Provide or assist in the provision of sporting facilities for young persons aged under 25 years of age so as to secure or advance their physical education and training and enhance their education generally; 5.3.3 Develop or assist in the development of the capacity and skills of the members of socially and economically disadvantaged communities within Warrington, Cheshire East and Cheshire West and Chester in such ways that they are better able to identify and help meet their needs in regard to physical and athletic recreation or other leisure-time physical and athletic activity, so improving their conditions of life; 5.3.4 Provide and assist in the provision of opportunities for physical and athletic recreation or other leisure-time physical activity for older people, so as to promote their health and well-being.
Area of benefit
CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Active Cheshire
Wyvern House
The Drumber
Winsford
Cheshire
CW7 1AH
- Phone:
- 01606330212
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window