Financial history JOHN GREAVES IRLAM SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity number: 701832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.45k £1.21k £2.64k £696 £908
Total expenditure £1.60k £1.71k £2.64k £1.22k £815
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A