Financial history Belle Isle Senior Action - BISA

Charity number: 701895
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £165.32k £159.79k £176.28k £199.16k £160.58k
Total expenditure £145.62k £134.33k £158.26k £140.79k £166.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £104.81k £115.00k £139.22k £161.63k £123.80k