EAST DURHAM COMMUNITY INITIATIVES LTD

Charity number: 701917
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £120.91k £123.17k £123.54k £157.63k £133.18k
Total expenditure £136.69k £136.62k £142.19k £141.56k £144.19k
Income from government contracts £71.28k £71.28k N/A £71.28k £71.28k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £71.28k N/A N/A