ST BRIDGET'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 701956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £3.05k £3.04k £3.26k £3.26k £3.33k
Total expenditure £1.98k £2.61k £3.27k £3.43k £2.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A