NEW TRUST FOR THE KING'S SCHOOL AT GRANTHAM IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education. Providing extra facilities for students in school in the form of equipment or assistance with additions/changes to classroom facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 14 September 1989: Standard registration
- THE NEW TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL GREEN | Chair | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Simon Pickett | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Richard Tollemache | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Gibbs | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ROSS | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL GIBSON | Trustee | 12 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ROTHWELL LEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.83k | £4.12k | £3.12k | £4.24k | £464 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68k | £13.29k | £3.28k | £3.00k | £150.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 March 2021 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JULY 1989 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 24 AUGUST 1989 AND 29 NOVEMBER 1996 AND A SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER S. 75A OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 ON 9 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST IS TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOL AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE TRUSTEES MAY: I) PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL II) PROVIDE BENEFITS OF ANY KIND FOR THE SCHOOL III) PROMOTE IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE KINGS SCHOOL
BROOK STREET
GRANTHAM
NG31 6RP
- Phone:
- 01476539938
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window