AIREBOROUGH GILBERT AND SULLIVAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 702034
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required