AIREBOROUGH GILBERT AND SULLIVAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 702034
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £20.40k £24.78k £15.74k £11.53k £713
Total expenditure £20.67k £25.30k £15.37k £13.69k £1.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A