DENBY LADIES (SENIOR CITIZENS) COMMITTEE

Charity number: 702116
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required