DENBY LADIES (SENIOR CITIZENS) COMMITTEE

Charity number: 702116
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.63k £2.67k £3.09k £3.36k £77
Total expenditure £2.96k £3.46k £3.05k £3.91k £663
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A