MAHARISHI VALMIK SABHA COVENTRY (ENGLAND) TRUST

Charity number: 702136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 23 March 2021 327 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 23 March 2021 327 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 24 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 19 December 2018 233 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 09 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required