MAHARISHI VALMIK SABHA COVENTRY (ENGLAND) TRUST

Charity number: 702136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £15.42k £23.02k £20.99k £28.31k £18.35k
Total expenditure £11.78k £13.51k £12.50k £17.98k £18.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A