Financial history NEW SIGHT INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 702150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £66.68k £76.41k £77.81k £58.71k £62.76k
Total expenditure £66.40k £76.85k £70.64k £58.82k £69.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A