Trustees MARY CLOWES HALL
Charity number: 702162

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Davis | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Luscombe | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Antonita Charlene Haire | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Rebecca Wright | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Sillitto | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosalyn Joy Chadfield | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Patricia Lewis | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Lewer | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Peter Carr | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Mosley | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Butler | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.