Accounts and annual returns SADDLEWORTH OUTDOOR PURSUITS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 29 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 03 December 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 24 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 19 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 22 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required