Financial history ACTION HOMELESS (LEICESTER) LIMITED

Charity number: 702230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.32m £2.34m £2.55m £2.96m £3.39m
Total expenditure £2.04m £2.12m £2.28m £2.65m £2.92m
Income from government contracts £182.52k £237.96k £288.21k £317.05k £413.56k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £228.91k £487.35k
Income - Donations and legacies £369.61k £295.20k £272.10k £376.10k £599.10k
Income - Other trading activities £25.96k £25.61k £25.49k £16.83k £10.54k
Income - Charitable activities £1.93m £2.02m £2.26m £2.56m £2.69m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.16k £5.54k £514 £4.78k £3.51k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £87.33k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.02m £2.10m £2.26m £2.62m £2.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.13k £20.26k £24.12k £28.53k £18.72k
Expenditure - Governance £76.23k £83.04k £81.44k £90.91k £75.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0