Trustees ACTION HOMELESS (LEICESTER) LIMITED

Charity number: 702230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pravin Parmar Trustee 31 March 2022
None on record
Kelly-Marie Gallagher Trustee 31 March 2022
None on record
James Elsey Trustee 31 March 2022
None on record
Amit Patel Trustee 31 March 2022
None on record
Allison Peasgood Trustee 07 August 2019
None on record
Mary Margaret Pankhurst Trustee 01 December 2018
None on record
David John Ireland Trustee 29 March 2018
None on record
Claire Hurst Trustee 30 November 2017
None on record
Stephen de Looze Trustee 30 November 2017
None on record