THE FIVE LAMPS ORGANISATION

Charity number: 702314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 May 2019 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 May 2019 90 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time Download