THE LEICESTERSHIRE NEUROLOGICAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Leicestershire Neurological Trust provides funds for individuals within the university hospitals of Leicester to pursue individual educational and research activity in the area of neurological disease. It also funds equipment to enable individuals to pursue these activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 09 January 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sukaina Asad | Chair | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ei Zune The | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tina Ramnani | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Subha Vandabona | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rama Shankar Prasad | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin Simpson | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.15k | £4.47k | £4.54k | £5.64k | £5.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.00k | £3.44k | £2.80k | £160 | £13.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 12 November 2023 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 DECEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
-TO RELIEVE SUFFERING IN ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. A) BY PROMOTING & ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF AID RESEARCH INTO THE OPERATION OF THENEUROMUSCULAR SYSTEM THROUGHOUT THE HUMAN BODY AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH B)BY PAYING OR CONTRIBUTING TOWARDS THE COST OF PROVIDING ADDITIONAL CARE AND FACILITIES NOT AVAILABLE UNDER THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE FOR NEEDY PATIENTS SUFFERING BY REASON OF NERVOUS SYSTEM DISORDERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Neurology Department
Leicester General Hospital
Gwendolen Road
Leicester
LE5 4PW
- Phone:
- 0116 258 8198
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window