CARDIFF COUNTY AND VALE OF GLAMORGAN YOUTH BRASS BAND PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote & advance the musical education of children & young persons under the age of 21 in the Cardiff and Vale of Glamorgan area.In particular to advance their knowledge and appreciation of Brass Band Music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 19 December 1989: Standard registration
- THE SOUTH GLAMORGAN YOUTH BRASS BAND PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES MAYNARD | Chair | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
BETHAN JONES | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.21k | £3.72k | £3.76k | £30 | £12 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.35k | £4.14k | £4.28k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 277 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 277 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 643 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 643 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 September 2022 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 229 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JANUARY 1989 AS AMENDED 8 NOVEMBER 1989, AND FURTHER AMENDED 27 JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 21 YEARS WHO ARE ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN OR WHO RECEIVE THEIR EDUCATION WITHIN THE COUNTY OF SOUTH GLAMORGAN AND IN PARTICULAR TO FOSTER THEIR KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF BRASS BAND MUSIC.
Area of benefit
SOUTH GLAMORGAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Waterfall Mews
Ham Manor Park
Llantwit Major
CF61 1BA
- Phone:
- 01446790225
- Email:
- CCVGHSO@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window