THE ALTRINCHAM AND DISTRICT DOG TRAINING SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dog Training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Trafford
Governance
- 09 January 1990: Standard registration
- THE ALTRINCHAM & DISTRICT DOG TRAINING SOCIETY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sylvia Davenport | Chair | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Taylor | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
FIONA LAURA CLUCAS | Trustee | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS CARYS CAMM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLADYS SINCLAIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAVIS KELLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.02k | £31.17k | £19.66k | £13.53k | £11.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.57k | £13.79k | £16.00k | £14.02k | £10.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF 1955 AS AMENDED 5 OCTOBER 1989, AS AMENDED 17TH MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH AND THE PROTECTION OF THE PUBLIC FROM NUISANCE BY PROMOING HIGH STANDARDS OF RESPONSIBLE DOG OWNERSHIP IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- A) TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THE TRAINING OF DOGS IN OBEDIENCE WORK, AND ANY OTHER BRANCH OF TRAINING WHICH FROM TIME TO TIME MAY BE CONSIDERED ADVISABLE, DESIRABLE AND/OR NECESSARY, BUT ALWAYS EXCLUDING MANWORK; B) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN FACILITIES FOR THE TRAINING O DOGS AND EDUCATING MEMBERS IN THE CORRECT METHOD OF TRAINING AND HANDLING DOGS; AND C) TO DO ALL SUCH LAWFUL TINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL AND CONCLUSIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 WAVERLEY ROAD
SALE
M33 7EY
- Phone:
- 01619626189
- Email:
- info@dogclass.co.uk
- Website:
-
dogclass.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window