DERBYSHIRE LAW CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 702419
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 May 2019 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 May 2019 119 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)