THE FRIENDS OF ST LUKES CHURCH WHITLEY,WARRINGTON

Charity number: 702461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £734 £471 £441 £488 £439
Total expenditure £118 £0 £3.36k £11 £8
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A