GREYHOUND RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide any greyhound in need of care, ex racers or other, in the safe environment of the charity's kennels until re-homed, or in the case of any greyhound not suitable for rehoming to offer a permanent home within the charity's care for the rest of their natural life span.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 March 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN SCHULTZ | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Karen Rowland | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
RUTH NICHOLSON GRINDROD | Trustee | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ANNE NICHOLSON GRINDROD | Trustee | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAWN SCHULTZ | Trustee | 21 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.39k | £16.42k | £154.62k | £18.82k | £125.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.92k | £38.54k | £46.09k | £50.46k | £85.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 JANUARY 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE CARE AND PROTECTION BY MEANS OF TEMPORARY SHELTER, AND SUITABLE HOMES, FOR GREYHOUNDS AND WHIPPETS THAT HAVE BEEN I) ABANDONED, II) ILL TREATED AND III) OR WHO ARE IN DANGER OF BEING MEDICALLY DESTROYED. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE THE TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CRIMEA COTTAGE
SUTTERTON DROVE
AMBER HILL
BOSTON
PE20 3RP
- Phone:
- 01205290145
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window