CROXDALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702536
Charity reporting is overdue by 1182 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 86 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 86 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 451 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 451 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 817 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 817 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1182 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1182 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required