CROXDALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702536
Charity reporting is overdue by 1176 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 10/01/2015 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £7.63k £7.96k £8.47k £15.80k £16.32k
Total expenditure £7.10k £11.97k £6.69k £6.69k £19.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £195 £390
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £300 £2.00k