Accounts and annual returns THE LODGE OF ST MICHAEL NO 7833 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 702546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 08 January 2025 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 07 January 2025 706 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 06 January 2025 1070 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 27 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required