THE LINCOLN SPIRITUAL ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Lincoln Spiritual Association offers religious services, training, guidance and support to anyone interested in Spiritualism and Spiritual Healing to all
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 22 March 1990: Standard registration
- 02 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 243017 LINCOLNSHIRE Y.M.C.A. LTD
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 701839 LINCOLNSHIRE MS THERAPY CENTRE LTD
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 299679 Sands
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1098653 LINCOLNSHIRE VINTAGE VEHICLE SOCIETY LIMITED
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1075601 BRANSBY HORSES
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1046933 LINCOLNSHIRE EMPLOYMENT ACCOMMODATION PROJECT LIMI...
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1017501 Lincolnshire and Nottinghamshire Air Ambulance Cha...
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1098364 LINCOLNSHIRE INTEGRATED VOLUNTARY EMERGENCY SERVIC...
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1075601 BRANSBY HORSES
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 500272 THE ASSOCIATION OF THE FRIENDS OF LINCOLN CATHEDRA...
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1119915 HILL HOLT WOOD
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1175176 LINCOLN COMMUNITY LARDER
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1122451 LINCOLN STREET PASTORS
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 225348 ROYAL BRITISH LEGION POPPY FACTORY LIMITED
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 296645 ALZHEIMER'S SOCIETY
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 208217 THE PEOPLE'S DISPENSARY FOR SICK ANIMALS
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 703143 LINCOLN PELICAN TRUST LIMITED
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 214779 THE SALVATION ARMY
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1139749 THE BRIDGES COMMUNITY TRUST
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1178696 BOMBER COUNTY GATEWAY TRUST
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 288260 THE HAEMOPHILIA SOCIETY
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1000514 LIDAS (LINCOLN INTEGRATED DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICES)
- 02 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1132353 LINCOLN & LINDSEY BLIND SOCIETY
- LINCOLN SPIRITUALIST CHURCH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.93k | £5.87k | £6.87k | £6.32k | £2.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.57k | £4.26k | £4.09k | £4.20k | £122.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 14 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 26 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 17 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 21 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/12/1989 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2010 AS AMENDED ON 02/06/2013
Charitable objects
A) THE HOLDING OF RELIGIOUS SERVICES FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP.B) SPIRITUAL HEALING OF THE SICK. C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM. D) THE TRAINING OF ALL IN THE PRINCIPLE OF THE RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM. E) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY BE DECIDED UPON FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window