Accounts and annual returns THE ROY THOMAS TRUST

Charity number: 702723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required