NEWGROUND TOGETHER

Charity number: 702800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 09 January 2017 On time Download