Financial history NEWGROUND TOGETHER

Charity number: 702800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.78m £4.77m £7.29m £8.17m £11.20m
Total expenditure £5.20m £5.10m £7.93m £8.38m £10.89m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £200.00k £428.04k
Income - Other trading activities £3.22m £4.01m £6.45m £7.12m £9.64m
Income - Charitable activities £916.59k £757.13k £814.74k £842.00k £949.74k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.90k £1.88k £2.12k £5.30k £732
Income - Other £1.64m £500 £25.00k £0 £178.08k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.23m £1.27m £1.75m £1.64m £1.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.96m £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £85.51k £44.01k £66.56k £135.03k £124.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £82.01k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £3.83m £6.17m £6.74m £9.15m