Financial history THE DURHAM LESOTHO DIOCESAN LINK

Charity number: 702809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £46.08k £48.47k £63.11k £45.32k £58.85k
Total expenditure £46.50k £48.77k £54.97k £54.08k £40.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A