BAYNTON FORD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 702849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £950 £2.55k £753 £7.10k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A