8TH COVENTRY (ST NICHOLAS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 702865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.50k £8.53k £4.40k £4.40k £28.50k
Total expenditure £7.97k £6.25k £3.85k £2.58k £5.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £28.00k