THE BLACK COUNTRY GROUNDWORK TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 702917
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £6.25m £4.34m £2.95m £2.66m £3.64m
Total expenditure £6.42m £4.59m £2.93m £2.50m £3.60m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £83.50k £83.50k £83.50k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £935.83k £471.87k £769.33k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.91m £2.04m £2.79m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £250 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £19.62k £63.61k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.77m £2.03m £3.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £126.15k £52.51k £92.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £16.57k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0