BEATRICE FOTHERBY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 702969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 November 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 July 2019 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 04 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required