BILTON GRANGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702986
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required