THE DIOCESAN DIGEST SOUND MAGAZINE OF LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 702995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.50k £434 £658 £2.67k £2.95k
Total expenditure £1.37k £1.36k £1.28k £2.02k £2.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A