THE DIOCESAN DIGEST SOUND MAGAZINE OF LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a mailing of tapes or memory sticks monthly to visually impaired recipients giving details of activities within the Lichfield diocese which we feel may be of interest. These are mainly of a religious nature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 11 June 1990: Standard registration
- DIOCESAN DIGEST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leslie Reason | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Edward Snodgrass Primrose | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gregory Austin David Platten | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Colin Malcolm Gelder | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET ROSALINE HILL - GIBBS | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.67k | £2.95k | £245 | £358 | £90 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.02k | £2.05k | £745 | £796 | £635 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/03/1990 AS AMENDED ON 16 JANUARY 1990, 1 MARCH 1994 AND 26/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY-SIGHTED, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF A REGULAR EDITION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Diocesan Digest Sound Magazine
St. Marys House
The Close
LICHFIELD
Staffordshire
WS13 7LD
- Phone:
- 01543306100
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window