THE DIOCESAN DIGEST SOUND MAGAZINE OF LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 702995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Major ERIC HARDING rtd Chair 16 July 2018 None on record
Rev Gregory Austin David Platten Trustee 12 October 2020
LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL SCHOOL Received: On time
Dr Colin Malcolm Gelder Trustee 11 July 2019 None on record
Rev David Edward Snodgrass Primrose Trustee 12 July 2021
BLACK COUNTRY URBAN INDUSTRIAL MISSION Received: On time
JANET ROSALINE HILL - GIBBS Trustee 27 July 2015 None on record