BROOK YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity number: 703015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.16m £11.26m £10.35m £9.16m £9.86m
Total expenditure £13.71m £12.28m £10.91m £9.22m £9.79m
Income from government contracts £10.24m £0 £8.68m £7.72m £4.54m
Income from government grants £278.19k £23.48k £649.38k £654.89k £1.03m
Income - Donations and legacies £96.28k £86.58k £72.85k £81.14k £50.30k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £11.88m £10.94m £9.60m £8.33m £8.55m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £3.97k £0 £0
Income - Other £169.08k £56.20k £22.23k £100.92k £1.27m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.71m £12.28m £10.90m £9.22m £9.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £14.38k £4.93k £28.27k
Expenditure - Governance £179.42k £153.69k £0 £24.29k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0