ROYAL HALLAMSHIRE HOSPITAL CRITICAL CARE AND STROKE APPEAL FUND

Charity number: 703021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 26 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 06 December 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 06 December 2020 372 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 09 January 2019 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 22 March 2018 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required