Accounts and annual returns WYLAM WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 703055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 March 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required