Financial history WYLAM WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 703055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.12k £2.92k £2.76k £4.27k £446
Total expenditure £3.68k £2.88k £2.65k £5.14k £578
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A