Accounts and annual returns AL-MADINA ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 703065
Charity reporting is overdue by 234 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 234 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 234 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 November 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 November 2022 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 April 2022 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 April 2022 158 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 February 2021 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 February 2021 115 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 February 2021 480 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 February 2021 480 days late Download Open in new window