Financial history AL-MADINA ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 703065
Charity reporting is overdue by 232 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £86.61k £44.83k £76.11k £100.95k £63.43k
Total expenditure £6.19k £23.95k £27.91k £24.10k £29.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £4.93k N/A