BOURNE OUTDOOR SWIMMING POOL PRESERVATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Open air swimming pool for the use of all
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 11 July 1990: Standard registration
- 27 August 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 27 August 2013: Funds transferred to 1151030 BOURNE OUTDOOR SWIMMING POOL
- BOURNE OUTDOOR POOL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | 31/10/2011 | 01/05/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41 | £56.98k | £55.08k | £54.90k | £75.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49 | £61.54k | £51.45k | £55.82k | £83.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2013 | 14 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2011 | 10 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2011 | 10 June 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | 22 March 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | 22 March 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | 08 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | 09 May 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUNE 1990 AS AMENDED 26 JUNE 1991.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE SWIMMING & ASSOCIATED FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INBATITANTS OF BOURNE & SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS IN A COMMON EFFORD TO ADVANCE EDUCATION & TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION & LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO MAINTAIN & MANAGE A SWIMMING POOL FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE TRUST IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABVOE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
INHABITANTS OF BOURNE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window