Financial history ELLYS EXTRA CARE LIMITED

Charity number: 703127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £63.98k £68.23k £68.65k £73.55k £98.65k
Total expenditure £69.05k £72.82k £81.57k £73.15k £107.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A